+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 25, 1992 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate passed companion measure H.R. 5194 in lieu of this measure by Voice Vote.
- Senate incorporated this measure in H.R. 5194 as an amendment.
- S.AMDT.3198 Amendment SP 3198 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3198 Proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Kohl. In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On September 8, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 657.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 102-393. Additional views filed.
On July 30, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 2, 1992 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Juvenile Justice. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 102-1085.
On May 28, 1992 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Juvenile Justice.
On May 21, 1992 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3198
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor