+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 117-208.
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
On September 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7942)
On September 19, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2771.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7942-7944)
- Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S998)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S998)
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S998)
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S998)
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor