+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 21, 2020 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On December 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7866-7867; text: CR S7866-7867)
On December 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 627.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment. With written report No. 116-324.
On July 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
On October 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor