+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 30, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-404.
- Signed by President.
On September 20, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 20, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 18, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On September 18, 1978 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On September 15, 1978 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #783 .
On August 15, 1978 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-1494.
On August 11, 1978 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On August 8, 1978 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On July 11, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 11655 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On May 25, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On May 15, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Environment and Public Works with amendment, S. Rept. 95-835.
On March 9, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor