+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 3, 2004 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 108-443.
- Signed by President.
On November 22, 2004 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 16, 2004 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2693 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Platts moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On October 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor