+ − Actions (9)
On August 4, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Hearings held.
On August 2, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Hearings held.
On July 28, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Hearings held.
On July 19, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Hearings held.
On July 14, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On June 30, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On June 24, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On June 23, 1982 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
On June 22, 1982 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor