+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 22, 1976 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Public law 94-290.
On May 12, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On May 11, 1976 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On May 10, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to Senate amendment.
On March 16, 1976 in the House:
- Senate agreed to House amendment with an amendment.
On February 2, 1976 in the House:
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 8628 .
- Measure considered in House.
On December 2, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
On December 1, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On November 20, 1975 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-488.
On November 5, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Rules and Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor