+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 19, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Signed by President.
On October 11, 1984 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 10, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 9, 1984 in the House:
- House Agreed to Conference Report by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On October 9, 1984 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report by Voice Vote.
On October 9, 1984 in the House:
- Conference Report 98-1154 Filed in House.
On October 5, 1984 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to request for conference. Appointed conferees. Hatch; Denton; Nickles; Kennedy; Dodd.
On September 26, 1984 in the House:
- Senate disagreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
- House Requested a Conference and Speaker Appointed Conferees: Dingell, Scheuer, Waxman, Broyhill, Madigan.
On August 10, 1984 in the House:
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On August 10, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On August 10, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- House Inserted the Text of H.R.5600 as an Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute.
- House Insisted on its Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On June 29, 1984 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate.
- S.AMDT.3380 Amendment SP 3380 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3380 Proposed by Senator Dole for Senator Denton. To make a technical correction.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 940.
On May 25, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Denton under the authority of the order of May 11, 84 with amendments. With written report No. 98-496.
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On May 9, 1984 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Family and Human Services. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment favorably.
On May 8, 1984 in the Senate:
On May 1, 1984 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3380
To make a technical correction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor