+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On October 25, 1984 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 98-545.
On October 16, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 15, 1984 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 10, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Foreign Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 3, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Operations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
On October 1, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
On September 26, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 17, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1180.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Percy without amendment. With written report No. 98-602.
On September 12, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 24, 1984 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor