+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 27, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-524.
- Signed by President.
On October 25, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 14, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 14, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to conference report, division vote .
- Motion to delete certain provisions rejected in House, division vote .
On October 13, 1978 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On October 11, 1978 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 95-1325.
On October 11, 1978 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-1765.
On October 2, 1978 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On September 22, 1978 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 12452 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On August 25, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #367 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
On August 22, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On May 15, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Human Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 95-891.
On February 23, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor