+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 2, 1992 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
On May 29, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 22, 1992 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On May 21, 1992 in the House:
- Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On May 20, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
- Committee on Armed Services discharged.
- Mr. Aspin asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- H.AMDT.550 Amendments offered by Mr. Aspin. Amendments delete language designating the Vice Chairman as a member of the Joint Chiefs of Staff, and provisions which authorize joint duty credit for equivalent duty in Operations Desert Storm and Desert Shield.
- H.AMDT.550 On agreeing to the Aspin amendments Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On April 29, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On April 29, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On April 28, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 446.
On April 9, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Armed Services. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Nunn. With written report No. 102-270.
- Committee on Armed Services ordered to be reported an original measure.
On April 7, 1992 in the Senate:
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.550
Amendments delete language designating the Vice Chairman as a member of the Joint Chiefs of Staff, and provisions which authorize joint duty credit for equivalent duty in Operations Desert Storm and Desert Shield.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor