+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 116-101. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On December 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 9, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9378)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 256.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9378-9380)
- Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Received in the House.
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4652-4664; text: CR S4660)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 42.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-11.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor