+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 115-261.
- Signed by President.
On September 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On September 25, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H8838)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8838)
- Mr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
On July 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Received in the House.
On June 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4810-4811; text: CR S4810-4811)
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered on report 115-261.
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- An errata sheet on written report No. 115-261 was printed. (text: 115S.Rept.261 errata)
- By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-261.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 414.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1766)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Chuck Grassley
Type:
Primary Sponsor