+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 21, 1984 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-392.
- Signed by President.
On August 17, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On August 15, 1984 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On August 9, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 9, 1984 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On August 8, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On May 22, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On May 8, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 850.
- Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Mathias with an amendment. With written report No. 98-433.
On May 1, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On April 26, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules. Hearings held.
On April 11, 1984 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor