+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On September 26, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered favorably reported H.R. 4687 in lieu of this measure.
On September 19, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 12, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Federal Energy Regulatory Commission.
On June 26, 1990 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-453.
On June 14, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Federal Energy Regulatory Commission.
On June 13, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
On May 2, 1990 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On May 1, 1990 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor