+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
On November 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7490)
- S.Amdt.1637 Amendment SA 1637 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.1637 Amendment SA 1637 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Hoeven. (consideration: CR S7470; text: CR S7490) To amend the authorization of appropriations for the Native American languages grant program under section 803C of the Native American Programs Act of 1974.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7490)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 30.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-23.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported favorably.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 1637
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.1637
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.