+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On September 27, 2016 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5938-5945)
- H.Amdt.1434 On agreeing to the Walden amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- H.Amdt.1434 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Walden.
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5938-5945)
- Mr. Walden asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4059-4061; text as passed Senate: CR S4059-4061)
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 100.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-58.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
+ − Amendment
H.Amdt.1434
Amendment strikes all after the enacting clause and inserts a complete new text.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor