+ − Summary
+ − Actions (19)
On November 16, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-665.
- Signed by President.
On November 8, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 22, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On April 11, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Agriculture Department. Unfavorable.
On January 22, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Agriculture Department. Unfavorable.
On October 9, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On October 5, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On October 5, 1987 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 1, 1987 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Agriculture Department.
On September 25, 1987 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 337.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston without amendment. With written report No. 100-174.
On September 16, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On January 6, 1987 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor