+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 7, 1990 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 101-533.
On October 30, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 26, 1990 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 23, 1990 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Ritter demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
- Mr. Walgren moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 19, 1990 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.3049 Amendment SP 3049 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.3049 Proposed by Senator Mitchell for Senator Hollings. In the nature of a substitute.
On October 19, 1990 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
On October 19, 1990 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 19, 1990 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On August 30, 1990 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 797.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Hollings under the authority of the order of Aug 2, 90 with amendments. With written report No. 101-443.
On July 31, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On July 19, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Hearings held.
On May 18, 1990 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.1664 Referred to the Committee on Commerce. To amend the International Investment and Trade in Services Survey Act.
On April 25, 1990 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.1664
To amend the International Investment and Trade in Services Survey Act.
S.AMDT.3049
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor