+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
On October 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Received in the House.
On October 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6391-6397; text: CR S6391-6397)
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 567.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-335.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.