+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 117-134.
- Signed by President.
On June 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 1, 2 Present (Roll no. 200). (text: 05/16/2022 CR H4994)
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 1, 2 Present (Roll no. 200).
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5080-5081)
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4994-4996)
- Mr. Trone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2514.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On December 20, 2021 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9306-9307; text: CR S9307)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On December 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 196.
- Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester without amendment. Without written report.
On December 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor