+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On July 18, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia, H. Rept. 95-1367.
On June 8, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
On June 7, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On May 16, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs, S. Rept. 95-893.
On February 7, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor