+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 31, 2007 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 110-175.
- Signed by President.
On December 21, 2007 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 18, 2007 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2488 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Clay moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On December 17, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Received in the House.
On December 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor