+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 29, 2000 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On September 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 686.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-345 .
On June 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor