+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 23, 1989 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-123.
- Signed by President.
On October 13, 1989 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 12, 1989 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 10, 1989 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- The chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
- Mr. Hughes moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 6, 1989 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 172.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 101-273. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
On October 3, 1989 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Subcommittee on Crime Discharged.
On April 20, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
On April 12, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On April 5, 1989 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 82-16.
- S.AMDT.15 Motion to table SP 15 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 55-43.
- S.AMDT.15 Proposed by Senator Bumpers. To eliminate the reward provisions of the Major Fraud Act Amendments of 1989.
- S.AMDT.14 Amendment SP 14 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.14 Proposed by Senator Metzenbaum. To clarify the discretion of the Attorney General and for other purposes.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On March 13, 1989 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 25.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden under the authority of the order of Mar 9, 89 without amendment. With written report No. 101-7.
On February 23, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On January 25, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor