+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On September 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Appropriations. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Specter. With written report No. 105-300 .
- Committee on Appropriations ordered to be reported an original measure.
On September 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Appropriations Subcommittee on Senate Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-872.
On April 1, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Appropriations Subcommittee on Senate Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral.
On March 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Appropriations Subcommittee on Senate Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral.
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Appropriations Subcommittee on Senate Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral.
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor