+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 22, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-528.
- Signed by President.
On November 14, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 26, 2000 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 25, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 24, 2000 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
On October 23, 2000 in the House:
- Mr. LaTourette moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2440 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 4, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Received in the House.
On October 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On August 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 764.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/26/2000 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-388 .
On June 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On April 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor