+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 10, 2000 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Oberstar objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2438 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Shuster moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: : 232 - 158 .
On September 11, 2000 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On September 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.4130 Amendment SA 4130 proposed by Senator Gorton for Senator McCain. To incorporate additional provisions in, and make minor modifications to, the bill as reported by the committee.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4130 Amendment SA 4130 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
On August 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 763.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/26/2000 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-387 . Additional views filed.
On June 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On April 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4130
To incorporate additional provisions in, and make minor modifications to, the bill as reported by the committee.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor