+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-209.
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 354.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. Without written report.
On November 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On November 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
On August 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor