+ − Actions (26)
On October 12, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-291.
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 1, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 1, 1982 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments to House Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate concurred in the House amendments with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.UP.AMDT.1376 Amendment SU 1376 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.UP.AMDT.1376 Proposed by Senator Thurmond. To resolve certain differences between S. 2420 and H.R. 7191 .
On September 30, 1982 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on The Judiciary Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 29, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Justice.
On September 16, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
On September 14, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.UP.AMDT.1262 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.UP.AMDT.1262 Proposed by Senator Heinz. To provide technical and clarifying amendments to S.2420 .
On August 19, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 769.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 97-532.
On August 17, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 29, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Approved for full committee consideration with amendments favorably.
On May 27, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On May 3, 1982 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
On April 22, 1982 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.UP.AMDT.1262
To provide technical and clarifying amendments to
S.UP.AMDT.1376
To resolve certain differences between
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor