+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 1, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-424.
- Signed by President.
On October 20, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 17, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2412 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Shuster moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 5, 2000 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Held at the desk.
On October 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4288 Amendment SA 4288 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4288 Amendment SA 4288 proposed by Senator Roberts for Senator McCain. To make minor and technical corrections in the bill as reported, and for other purposes.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On August 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 762.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/26/2000 without amendment. With written report No. 106-386 .
On June 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4288
To make minor and technical corrections in the bill as reported, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor