+ − Actions (16)
On October 5, 1982 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
On September 28, 1982 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 28, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 23, 1982 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On September 23, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
On September 17, 1982 in the Senate:
- Considered by Senate.
- S.UP.AMDT.1263 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.UP.AMDT.1263 Proposed by Senator Baker for Senator McClure. A technical amendment to S. 2405 , as reported.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 778.
On September 9, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Domenici for Senator McClure with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 97-539.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On August 18, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands and Reserved Water. Hearings held.
On May 27, 1982 in the Senate:
On April 21, 1982 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Amendment
S.UP.AMDT.1263
A technical amendment to
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor