+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 12, 1992 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate passed companion measure H.R. 4990 in lieu of this measure by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate incorporated this measure in H.R. 4990 as an amendment.
On May 6, 1992 in the Senate:
- Returned to the Calendar . Calendar No. 452.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Yea-Nay Vote. 61-38.
- Considered by Senate.
On May 5, 1992 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by motion.
- S.AMDT.1789 Proposed by Senator Byrd. To rescind certain budget authority.
- S.AMDT.1790 Proposed by Senator Byrd to Amendment SP 1789. To rescind certain budget authority.
- S.AMDT.1791 Proposed by Senator McCain. To fully rescind funds proposed for rescission in R92-101 .
- S.AMDT.1791 Amendment SP 1791 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46-52.
- S.AMDT.1792 Proposed by Senator Brown. To express the sense of the Senate that funds should not be appropriated for programs and projects that have not met objective criteria throughout the appropriations.
- S.AMDT.1792 Amendment SP 1792 not agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1793 Proposed by Senator Brown. To make additional rescissions dropped by the Committee but included in the President's bill.
- S.AMDT.1793 Amendment SP 1793 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43-55.
- S.AMDT.1790 Amendment SP 1790 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1789 Amendment SP 1789 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
On April 30, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 452.
- Committee on Appropriations. Reported to Senate by Senator Byrd with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 102-274.
- Committee on Appropriations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
- Committee on Appropriations incorporated provisions of related measures S. 2402 , S. 2551 , S. 2570 in reported measure.
On March 25, 1992 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Budget pursuant to the order of January 30, 1975, as modified by the order of April 11, 1986, with instructions that the Budget Committee be authorized to report its views to the Appropriations Committee, and that the latter alone be authorized to report the bill.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations pursuant to the order of January 30, 1975, as modified by the order of April 11, 1986, with instructions that the Budget Committee be authorized to report its views to the Appropriations Committee, and that the latter alone be authorized to report the bill.
+ − Amendments (5)
S.AMDT.1789
To rescind certain budget authority.
S.AMDT.1790
To rescind certain budget authority.
S.AMDT.1791
To fully rescind funds proposed for rescission in R92-101 (Seawolf).
S.AMDT.1792
To express the sense of the Senate that funds should not be appropriated for programs and projects that have not met objective criteria throughout the appropriations.
S.AMDT.1793
To make additional rescissions dropped by the Committee but included in the President's bill.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor