+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 2, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On March 30, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.2875 Amendment SP 2875 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2875 Proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator Simpson. To provide that the increase in the Veterans' Administration loan fee shall take effect 14 days after enactment.
On March 22, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 721.
- Committee on Veterans. Reported to Senate by Senator Simpson without amendment and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 98-366.
On March 7, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Veterans. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 6, 1984 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2875
To provide that the increase in the Veterans' Administration loan fee shall take effect 14 days after enactment.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor