+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 21, 2012 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On December 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3424 Amendment SA 3424 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3424 Amendment SA 3424 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Begich. Of a perfecting nature.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On December 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 112-256 .
On November 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 551.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On July 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3424
Of a perfecting nature.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor