+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On October 30, 1978 in the House:
- Private Law 95-142.
- Signed by President.
On October 23, 1978 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 14, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House.
On October 4, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 95-1705.
On May 24, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
On May 23, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, with an amendment to the title.
On May 17, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 95-898.
On December 15, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor