+ − Actions (12)
On May 11, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-175.
- Signed by President.
On April 30, 1982 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On April 29, 1982 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On April 27, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Armed Services Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On April 22, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Military Installations and Facilities.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
On April 20, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
On April 15, 1982 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor