+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- See H.R.5550 .
On September 22, 1988 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On September 20, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 14, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on International Operations Discharged.
On July 11, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Operations.
On June 27, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
On June 27, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 23, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On June 21, 1988 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 744.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 11, 1988 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor