+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 22, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-538.
- Signed by President.
On December 11, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 9, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House.
On November 26, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, H. Rept. 93-1494.
On October 15, 1974 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On October 11, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On October 10, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1276.
On August 3, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor