+ − Actions (25)
On January 3, 1983 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
On December 22, 1982 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On December 21, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 18, 1982 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments to House Amendments.
- Senate concurred in the House amendments with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On December 17, 1982 in the Senate:
- Considered by Senate.
- S.UP.AMDT.1534 Amendment SU 1534 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.UP.AMDT.1534 Proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator Packwood. To add a new section, relating to the Board of Directors of the Public Broadcasting Corporation.
On December 17, 1982 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 365 - 14 .
On December 13, 1982 in the House:
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 555.
On September 28, 1982 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 97-888.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On September 23, 1982 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Consumer Protection and Finance Discharged.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Consumer Protection and Finance.
On September 14, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
On September 8, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On August 18, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 717.
On July 22, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Packwood with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 97-503.
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 14, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Communications. Hearings held.
On May 6, 1982 in the Senate:
On April 1, 1982 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Amendment
S.UP.AMDT.1534
To add a new section, relating to the Board of Directors of the Public Broadcasting Corporation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor