+ − Actions (14)
On October 1, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Intergovernmental Relations and Human Resources.
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB, ACIR.
On September 24, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
On September 23, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.UP.AMDT.1278 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.UP.AMDT.1278 Proposed by Senator Baker for Senator Mattingly. To reduce the number of hearings.
On August 3, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 733.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Durenberger without amendment. With written report No. 97-515.
On June 9, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from CBO.
On June 8, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs requested executive comment from Advisory Commission on Intergovernmental Relations.
On May 28, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 6, 1982 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Intergovernmental Relations.
On April 1, 1982 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendment
S.UP.AMDT.1278
To reduce the number of hearings.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor