+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 7, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 106-256.
On July 27, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 25, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2327 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.3620 Amendment SA 3620 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.3620 Amendment SA 3620 proposed by Senator Thomas for Senator Hollings. To establish a Commission on Ocean Policy, and for other purposes.
On June 26, 2000 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On June 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 26, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
On May 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 568.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain without amendment. With written report No. 106-301 .
On April 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3620
To establish a Commission on Ocean Policy, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor