+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On April 11, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Provisions of measure incorporated into measure S. 2582 ordered to be reported.
On March 27, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings concluded. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 98-908.
On March 22, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
On March 21, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
On March 20, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
On March 8, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
On March 7, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
On February 29, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
On February 22, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor