+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On August 4, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
On July 28, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On July 25, 1986 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 718.
On July 14, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Danforth without amendment. With written report No. 99-334.
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 12, 1986 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Business, Trade, and Tourism. Hearings held.
On April 18, 1986 in the Senate:
On April 15, 1986 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor