+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text as passed: CR S1691-1693)
- S.Amdt.2209 Amendment SA 2209 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2209 Amendment SA 2209 proposed by Senator Rounds for Senator Corker. (consideration: CR S1691; text: CR S1691) To require the Director of the Peace Corps to notify and consult with the Committees on Appropriations before opening, closing, significantly reducing, or suspending a domestic or overseas office or country program.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1688-1693)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 308.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with amendments. Without written report.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2209
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.2209
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.