+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 20, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
On September 17, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On September 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On August 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 680.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/22/04 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 108-324 .
On July 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Forests. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 108-575.
On April 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor