+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 16, 1998 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Installations and Facilities.
On October 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 105-390 .
On October 8, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to House National Security
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committee on National Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On October 7, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 633.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On September 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-689.
On July 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation.
On July 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor