+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 25, 1992 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On September 23, 1992 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- A similar measure H.R. 5726 was laid on the table without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- The House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 5726 . Agreed to without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Boucher asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
On September 9, 1992 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Held at the desk.
On August 12, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2946 Amendment SP 2946 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2946 Proposed by Senator Dole for Senator Gramm. To require the Securities and Exchange Commission to study the impact on investment advisers of large and small size, and the competitive impact on investment advisers located in non-urban areas, of fidelity bonding requirements.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On July 2, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 534.
- Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Riegle with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 102-312.
On May 21, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Banking. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On February 26, 1992 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2946
To require the Securities and Exchange Commission to study the impact on investment advisers of large and small size, and the competitive impact on investment advisers located in non-urban areas, of fidelity bonding requirements.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor