+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 3, 1990 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 914.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 101-491.
On September 19, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 22, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, and Office of Management and Budget.
On May 17, 1990 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
On April 30, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
On March 9, 1990 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On March 8, 1990 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor