+ − Actions (12)
On December 17, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 1025.
- Committee on Budget. Reported to Senate by Senator Domenici without amendment. Without written report.
On September 29, 1982 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Budget pursuant to the order of May 19, 1982, for not to exceed 30 days of continous session to consider only sections 102, 201, and 201.
On September 24, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 858.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Roth with amendments. Without written report.
On September 23, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On July 7, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from Consumer Product Safety Commission.
On May 21, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from Advisory Commission on Intergovernmental Relations.
On May 19, 1982 in the Senate:
- Referred jointly to the Committees on Budget; Governmental Affairs pursuant to the order of August 4, 1977, with instructions that if one Committee reports, the other Committee has thirty days of continous session to report or be discharged with the proviso that the Budget Committee consider only Sections 102 , 201 , 201, and 201 .
On April 22, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs requested executive comment from Advisory Commission on Intergovernmental Relations; GAO.
On March 31, 1982 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Federal Expenditures.
On March 23, 1982 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor